COMMUNITY FOOD ENTERPRISE LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to partner with the diverse people of Newham, the East London region, and nationally with those with similar needs, to safeguard and sustain their right to the right food as a fundamental condition for individual and community health and well-being. We will realise this mission by enhancing food access, by promoting best practices in diet and nutrition, and by appropriate education.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 04 September 2006: Standard registration
- CFE (Working name)
- COMMUNITY FOOD ENTERPRISE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hasan Anver | Trustee | 13 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
ERIC RAWLE SAMUEL | Trustee | 18 December 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.73k | £86.33k | £86.64k | £129.82k | £104.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.41k | £83.21k | £107.20k | £88.53k | £91.70k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £500 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 04 February 2025 | 4 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 12 March 2024 | 41 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 February 2023 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 05 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 08 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 JUNE 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 16 AUGUST 2006.
Charitable objects
1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE BENEFITS OF SOUND NUTRITION, COOKING AND OTHER FOOD SKILLS. 2) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC. 3) TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE SOCIALLY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET, THEIR NUTRITIONAL NEEDS, AND TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
UNIT 4A
THAMESIDE INDUSTRIAL ESTATE
FACTORY ROAD
LONDON
E16 2HB
- Phone:
- 02075119014
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window