SIDMOUTH FOLK WEEK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promoting in and around the town of Sidmouth in East Devon an annual festival of folk arts and other associated events both in Sidmouth and elsewhere which will encourage awareness, knowledge, understanding, conservation and appreciation of and participation in the folk arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £1,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 07 November 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Griffiths | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|||||
Beverley Langton | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rachel Anne Charles | Trustee | 06 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Francis Lockyear | Trustee | 17 July 2019 |
|
|||||
Colin John Trussell | Trustee | 28 March 2018 |
|
|
||||
EDWARD UPTON | Trustee | 30 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
JEAN SALT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Timothy David Ambrose Shardlow | Trustee |
|
||||||
BARRINGTON LISTER | Trustee |
|
||||||
JAMES DEREK SCHOFIELD | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £17.62k | £121.28k | £37.09k | £26.50k | £54.43k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.53k | £126.46k | £35.77k | £26.15k | £47.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £1.50k | N/A | £1.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 27 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 15 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE CHARITY'S OBJECTS ("FEE OBJECTS") ARE: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC BY PROMOTING, IN AND AROUND THE TOWN OF SIDMOUTH IN EAST DEVON, AN ANNUAL FESTIVAL OF FOLK ARTS AND OTHER ASSOCIATED EVENTS, BOTH IN SIDMOUTH AND ELSEWHERE, WHICH WILL ENCOURAGE AN AWARENESS, KNOWLEDGE, UNDERSTANDING, CONSERVATION AND APPRECIATION OF AND PARTICIPATION IN THE FOLK ARTS. SUCH FOLK ARTS WILL INCLUDE, BUT NOT BE LIMITED: TO" THE ARTS OF TRADITIONAL MUSIC, SONG, DANCE, DRAMA, STORYTELLING AND RELATED FOLKLORE, CUSTOMS, ARTS AND CRAFTS WHICH ORIGINATE, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND THEIR DEVELOPMENT INTO CONTEMPORARY FORMS.
Area of benefit
IN AND AROUND THE TOWN OF SIDMOUTH IN EAST DEVON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 3
Fairleigh
Manor Road
Sidmouth
EX10 8RR
- Phone:
- 01395515146
- Email:
- tdashardlow@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window