MID SUSSEX CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAUX
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The establishment and running of Citizens Advice Bureau services and outlets supplying a free, independent, confidential and impartial service of advice, information and counsel for the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
- Surrey
- West Sussex
Governance
- 01 November 2005: Standard registration
- 25 June 2013: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 25 June 2013: Funds transferred to 1116660 CITIZENS ADVICE IN WEST SUSSEX (NORTH, SOUTH, EAST...
- EAST GRINSTEAD CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £160.73k | £274.40k | £232.93k | £232.92k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.42k | £226.00k | £209.91k | £209.91k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 25 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 18 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 18 January 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 22 MARCH 2007.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN EAST GRINSTEAD, HAYWARDS HEATH, BURGESS HILL MID SUSSEX AND SURROUNDING AREAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
EAST GRINSTEAD, HAYWARDS HEATH, BURGESS HILL MID SUSSEX AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window