BMC LAND AND PROPERTY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancement for the public use and enjoyment of and access to crags, mountains, hillsides and similar rural area and the advancement of publuc education, awareness, knowledge and understanding of them and their environmental improvement and protection.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 21 December 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Wragg | Trustee | 03 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRITISH MOUNTAINEERING COUNCIL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT MOULTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £800 | £1.07k | £1.85k | £12.07k | £1.50k | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.05k | £14.79k | £10.27k | £20.61k | £36.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 23 January 2024 | 84 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
3. THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED (IN CONJUNCTION WHERE APPROPRIATE WITH OTHER BODIES OR PERSONS) ARE: (A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC USE AND ENJOYMENT OF AND ACCESS TO CRAGS, MOUNTAINS, HILLSIDES AND SIMILAR RURAL AREAS AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC EDUCATION, AWARENESS, KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THEM AND THEIR ENVIRONMENTAL IMPROVEMENT AND PROTECTION. (B) THE ADVANCEMENT OF PUBLIC HEALTH THROUGH THE PRACTICE OF THE AMATEUR SPORTS OF CLIMBING AND HILL WALKING ASSOCIATED WITH THE OBJECTS SET OUT AT CLAUSE 3(A) ABOVE. (C) SUCH OTHER OBJECTS, AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE BY THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES, AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
177-179 BURTON ROAD
WEST DIDSBURY
MANCHESTER
M20 2BB
- Phone:
- 01614456111
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window