HIGHER EDUCATION EXTERNAL RELATIONS ASSOCIATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
HEERA is a professional body working across the areas of press & public relations, marketing, alumni relations and fundraising in the higher education sector. It offers a wide range of networking, professional development and other support activities and facilities, as well as encouraging the sharing of good practice, experience and knowledge.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 January 2006: Standard registration
- 02 March 2022: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- HEERA (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2013 | 31/12/2014 | 31/12/2015 | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.98k | £9.03k | £6.11k | £7.93k | £300 | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.16k | £4.92k | £7.50k | £7.78k | £268 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | Not submitted |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 27 NOVEMBER 2003
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE AND ASSIST IN THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT IN UNIVERSITIES AND OTHER HIGHER EDUCATION INSTITUTIONS (THE INSTITUTIONS) AND IN PARTICULAR, BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING, BY PROVIDING AND MAINTAINING AN ORGANISATION TO OFFER TRAINING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT TO THOSE MEMBERS OF THE INSTITUTIONS INVOLVED IN PUBLIC AND MEDIA RELATIONS, ALUMNI RELATIONS, FUNDRAISING AND DEVELOPMENT AND OTHER EXTERNAL RELATIONS IN SUCH A WAY AS IS DESIGNED TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENT AND EFFECTIVE RUNNING OF THE INSTITUTIONS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window