NOTTINGHAMSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST CHARITABLE TRUST FUNDS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For any charitable purpose or purposes relating to the National Health Service. Provision of minibuses for the relief of sickness at Nottinghamshire Healthcare (NHS) Trust. The provision of training and education in topics related to healthcare and providing benefits for staff and patients to improve quality of service or for the relief in sickness.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

19 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 22 February 2007: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
18 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAUL DEVLIN | Chair | 01 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr ASHIEDU JOEL | Trustee | 24 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS FONDATION TRUST | Trustee | 31 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
DIANE HULL | Trustee | 23 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
BECKY SUTTON | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN ELCOCK | Trustee | 01 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
IFTI MAJID | Trustee | 01 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
SUSAN SUNDERLAND | Trustee | 20 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
ALISON WYLD | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER GUIVER | Trustee | 01 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAN SENSIER | Trustee | 04 April 2022 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL SMITH | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
PADDY TIPPING | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
FIONA DANIEL | Trustee | 02 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
ANGELA NIXON | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN WHITE | Trustee | 04 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS FOUNDATION TRUST | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
||||
TREVOR OMAN | Trustee | 24 January 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £85.86k | £245.96k | £62.21k | £78.60k | £70.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £148.07k | £105.72k | £127.33k | £114.08k | £113.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 19 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST MADE 29 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
FOR ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE OR PURPOSES RELATING TO THE NATIONAL HEALTH SERVICE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Linked charities
- NOTTINGHAMSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST (EXPENDABLE FUNDS) COMMON INVESTMENT FUND
- NOTTINGHAMSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST GENERAL PURPOSE CHARITY
- NOTTINGHAMSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST MINIBUS FUND
- NOTTINGHAMSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST PATIENTS WELFARE FUND
- NOTTINGHAMSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST STAFF WELFARE FUND
- NOTTINGHAMSHIRE HEALTHCARE NHS TRUST TRAINING FUND
- NOTTINGHAMSHIRE HEALTHCARE PATIENT AMENITIES FUND
- NURSES AND MIDWIVES CHARITY - ANNESLEY WOODHOUSE
- THE LADY MIDDLETON FUND
- 22 February 2007 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
CHARITABLE FUNDS MANAGER
GROUND FLOOR
200 LICHFIELD LANE
MANSFIELD
NOTTINGHAMSHIRE
NG18 4RG
- Phone:
- 01159691300
- Email:
- sue.hewitt@nottshc.nhs.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window