Accounts and annual returns THE NOEL CHAVASSE V.C. MEMORIAL ASSOCIATION

Charity Number: 1112413
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2013 05 August 2013 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2013 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2012 18 September 2012 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2012 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2011 21 September 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2011 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2010 21 September 2011 113 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2010 14 April 2011 On Time