THE PHOENIX CONCERT BAND AND INSTRUMENTAL ENSEMBLES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Band and Ensemble groups provide music for various events, inc.charity/community/church/private. The band owns some instruments providing opportunity for education and training within the local community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Barnsley
- Bradford City
- Calderdale
- Kirklees
- Leeds City
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 15 December 2005: Standard registration
- PHOENIX CONCERT BAND (Working name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hilary Pattison | Chair | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Angela Bridget Wright | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
HELEN RUTH NAKHWAL | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
HEATHER RODGERS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.30k | £6.46k | £7.30k | £10.67k | £11.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.59k | £6.56k | £7.98k | £11.32k | £9.98k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 19 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 25 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 14 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED ON 8 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE, IMPROVE AND MAINTAIN PUBLIC EDUCATION AND INVOLVEMENT IN, AND APPRECIATION OF THE ART AND SCIENCE OF WIND BAND MUSIC IN ALL ITS ASPECTS BY THE PRESENTATION OF WIND BAND CONCERTS. 2) TO PROMOTE THE ART AND SCIENCE OF WIND BAND MUSIC, IN PARTICULAR, BY THE PROVISION OF OPPORTUNITIES FOR MUSICIANS TO REHEARSE AND PERFORM. 3) FOR THE GENERAL PURPOSES OF SUCH CHARITABLE BODIES OR FOR SUCH OTHER PURPOSES AS SHALL BE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
43 King George Avenue
LEEDS
LS7 4LN
- Phone:
- 07753963112
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window