CAMDEN ABU DIS FRIENDSHIP ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Camden Abu Dis Friendship Association works to promote human rights and respect for international humanitarian law in Abu Dis. Palestine. We educate the public through publications, public meetings, friendship links and visits in both directions, and promote positive projects in Abu Dis in such fields as education, health and youth work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £3,950 from 1 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
50 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
- Occupied Palestinian Territories
Governance
- 13 January 2006: Standard registration
- CADFA (Working name)
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rumana Choudhury | Trustee | 19 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Ashan | Trustee | 16 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Fiona Millar | Trustee | 04 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
HUGH WALLIS | Trustee | 16 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Cristina Piccoli | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £131.27k | £73.47k | £84.99k | £115.56k | £145.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £119.87k | £71.73k | £87.63k | £118.13k | £124.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £25.44k | N/A | N/A | £3.95k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 04 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 21/06/2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 21/11/2013
Charitable objects
CADFA'S CHARITABLE OBJECTS ARE TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) AND RESPECT FOR INTERNATIONAL HUMANITARIAN LAW IN PALESTINE BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: * RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND HUMANITARIAN ISSUES RELEVANT TO THE ISRAELI-PALESTINIAN CONFLICT IN GENERAL AND TO THE SITUATION OF ABU DIS IN PARTICULAR; * RESEARCHING AND MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMANITARIAN LAW IN ABU DIS IN PARTICULAR AND PALESTINE MORE WIDELY; * EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS AND HUMANITARIAN LAW; * PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS AND THE OBSERVANCE OF HUMANITARIAN LAW; * WORKING TO ELIMINATE ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMANITARIAN LAW IN ABU DIS IN PARTICULAR AND PALESTINE MORE WIDELY;; * WORKING TO OBTAIN AND PROMOTE REDRESS FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSES AND INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMANITARIAN LAW IN ABU DIS IN PARTICULAR AND PALESTINE MORE WIDELY AND THEIR FAMILIES; * PROVIDING SUPPORT TO AND RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSES AND INFRINGEMENTS OF HUMANITARIAN LAW AND THEIR FAMILIES, IN ABU DIS IN PARTICULAR AND PALESTINE MORE WIDELY.
Area of benefit
THE AREA OF ABU DIS, PALESTINE
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 Fortess Road
Kentish Town
LONDON
NW5 1AD
- Phone:
- 0203 730 9890
- Email:
- contact@cadfa.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window