SOAR COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Promote, for the public benefit, urban regeneration in the North of Sheffield. Ensure that local people lead the regeneration process and engage them in the decisions that affect the quality of their lives. Support local organisations and help them to become more business like and more sustainable. Become sustainable and create wealth that can be used in the area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£2,362,739
Donations and legacies | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.57m | |
Other trading activities | £34.56k | |
Investments | £402.77k | |
Other | £355.04k |
Total expenditure:
£1,993,677
Raising funds | £10.30k | |
Charitable activities | £1.98m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £71,959 from 2 government contract(s) and £1,067,663 from 8 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £10.30k | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.98m | |
Retained for future use | £369.06k |
People

42 Employee(s)
16 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 10 November 2005: Standard registration
- SOAR (Working name)
- SOUTHEY AND OWLERTON AREA REGENERATION LIMITED (Working name)
- SOUTHEY AND OWLERTON AREA REGENERATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAIRE MARIE LANE | Chair | 03 September 2013 |
|
|
||||||||||
Hildah Tinashe | Trustee | 29 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||||
Joanne Hayles | Trustee | 28 June 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
TALIB HUSSAIN | Trustee | 17 May 2023 |
|
|
||||||||||
Bridget Kelly | Trustee | 23 November 2022 |
|
|||||||||||
Andrew David Male | Trustee | 25 February 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Josephine Towl | Trustee | 26 January 2021 |
|
|
||||||||||
Tessa Kate Godley | Trustee | 22 October 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||
Wan Ten Yap | Trustee | 23 July 2020 |
|
|||||||||||
Maxine Greaves | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|||||||||||
Rafik Abdulaziz Mohammed Al-Sakkaf | Trustee | 24 May 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Simon Peter Rippon | Trustee | 26 April 2018 |
|
|
||||||||||
Michael Leslie Chaplin Cllr | Trustee | 28 September 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
ABDUL KHAYUM Cllr | Trustee | 23 February 2017 |
|
|
||||||||||
PETER PRICE MBE | Trustee | 26 January 2015 |
|
|||||||||||
ELEANOR JANE HOULSTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.39m | £1.64m | £2.01m | £1.88m | £2.36m | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.53m | £1.77m | £2.08m | £2.13m | £1.99m | |
|
Income from government contracts | £721.07k | £113.01k | £76.24k | £129.87k | £71.96k | |
|
Income from government grants | £54.27k | £915.43k | £1.29m | £983.27k | £1.07m | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £23.74k | £21.97k | £25.85k | £14.71k | £34.56k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.01m | £1.28m | £1.62m | £1.43m | £1.57m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £336.19k | £306.18k | £337.70k | £388.81k | £402.77k | |
|
Income - Other | £21.91k | £25.79k | £29.90k | £47.54k | £355.04k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £1.51m | £1.77m | £2.08m | £2.12m | £1.98m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £19.20k | £4.86k | £7.89k | £8.16k | £10.30k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £12.29k | £13.24k | £12.99k | £14.84k | £14.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £30.91k | £33.90k | £30.69k | £23.38k | £28.50k | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £2.99m | £2.80m | £3.00m | £2.79m | £2.65m | |
|
Long-term investments | £100 | £100 | £0 | £15.15k | £6.07k | |
|
Other assets | £1.07m | £904.94k | £1.03m | £963.68k | £1.12m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £806.01k | £594.23k | £579.09k | £573.31k | £213.90k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 30 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 02/03/2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/10/2010 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 10/12/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 14/12/2012
Charitable objects
3.1 THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF URBAN OR RURAL REGENERATION IN AREAS OF SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC DEPRIVATION (AND IN PARTICULAR THE NORTH OF SHEFFIELD, SOUTH YORKSHIRE AS SHOWN EDGED IN BOLD ON THE ATTACHED PLAN) ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 3.1.1 THE RELIEF OF POVERTY 3.1.2 THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT 3.1.3 THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, TRAINING OR RETRAINING, PARTICULARLY AMONG UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE AND PROVIDING UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE WITH WORK EXPERIENCE 3.1.4 THE PROVISIONS OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, TECHNICAL ASSISTANCE OR BUSINESS ADVICE OR CONSULTANCY IN ORDER TO PROVIDE TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES FOR UNEMPLOYED PEOPLE IN CASES OF FINANCIAL OR OTHER CHARITABLE NEED THROUGH HELP (I) IN SETTING UP THEIR OWN BUSINESS, OR (II) TO EXISTING BUSINESSES 3.1.5 THE CREATION OF TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES BY THE CREATION OF WORKSPACE, BUILDINGS AND/OR LAND FOR USE ON FAVOURABLE TERMS 3.1.6 THE PROVISION OF HOUSING FOR THOSE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED AND THE IMPROVEMENT OF HOUSING IN THE PUBLIC SECTOR OR IN CHARITABLE OWNERSHIP PROVIDED THAT SUCH POWER SHALL NOT EXTEND TO RELIEVING ANY LOCAL AUTHORITIES OR OTHER BODIES OF A STATUTORY DUTY TO PROVIDE OR IMPROVE HOUSING 3.1.7 THE MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT OR PROVISION OF PUBLIC AMENITIES 3.1.8 THE PRESERVATION OF BUILDINGS OR SITES OF HISTORIC OR ARCHITECTURAL IMPORTANCE 3.1.9 THE PROVISION OF RECREATIONAL FACILITIES FOR THE PUBLIC AT LARGE OR THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES 3.1.10 THE PROTECTION OR CONSERVATION OF THE ENVIRONMENT 3.1.11 THE PROVISION OF PUBLIC HEALTH FACILITIES AND CHILDCARE 3.1.12 THE PROMOTION OF PUBLIC SAFETY AND PREVENTION OF CRIME 3.1.13 SUCH OTHER MEANS AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED SUBJECT TO THE PRIOR WRITTEN CONSENT OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS FOR ENGLAND AND WALES 3.2 TO DETERMINE STRATEGIES THAT WHEN IMPLEMENTED WILL ASSIST THE REGENERATION OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT, IN PARTNERSHIP WITH HM GOVERNMENT, SHEFFIELD CITY COUNCIL AND THE BUSINESS, COMMUNITY AND VOLUNTARY SECTOR AS APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
THE NORTH OF SHEFFIELD, SOUTH YORKSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
SOAR
SOAR WORKS ENTEPRISE CENTRE
14 KNUTTON RD
SHEFFIELD
S5 9NU
- Phone:
- 01142134065
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window