RESTORER CHRISTIAN CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
EMPOWERMENT CONFERENCES,BIBLE TEACHINGS, SUPPORTING COUNTRIES INDIA, JAMAICAN AND ZIMBABWE. DEVELOPING YOUNG PEOPLE SOCIAL SKILS, CHURCH SERVICES, COUNSELING, MARRIAGE COUNSELING
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- City Of Swansea
- Sandwell
- India
- Jamaica
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 26 April 2006: Standard registration
- RCC (Working name)
- RCC SANDWELL (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Courtney Copeland | Chair | 05 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Beverley Ffrench | Trustee | 05 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Laura Johnson | Trustee | 05 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Claire Copeland | Trustee | 05 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
MARGRET DAVIS | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
GARFIELD SPENCER | Trustee | 09 January 2014 |
|
|||||
REV FFRENCH | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.61k | £49.98k | £56.42k | £68.05k | £64.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £44.68k | £50.14k | £50.67k | £69.34k | £68.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £14.10k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 12 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
28 February 2023
(These accounts |
08 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 01 November 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 30 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 10 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 13 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 16 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
A) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS B) THE PROVISION OF A PLACE OF WORSHIP AND COMMUNITY CENTRE IN THE WEST MIDLANDS C) TO PROMOTE EDUCATION EMPLOYMENT OPPORTUNITIES ECONOMIC DEVELOPMENT AND SOCIAL INCLUSION IN THE WEST MIDLANDS.
Area of benefit
UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
7 WALNUT DRIVE
SMETHWICK
B66 3RS
- Phone:
- 01215652201
- Email:
- restorercentre@yahoo.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window