BOOST CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The general aim of the charity is to assist the disabled, special needs, the disadvantaged and other sports men, women or children where their talents have been overlooked.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
- Eswatini
Governance
- 07 November 2005: Standard registration
- BOOST (Working name)
- BOOST CT (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Susan Gardner | Trustee | 22 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
ALURIE MAYE DUTTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT IAN HOUSTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
Oliver Bartrum | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £154.44k | £233.17k | £170.00k | £230.87k | £254.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £128.51k | £219.21k | £212.00k | £197.12k | £244.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | 14 April 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 25 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 20 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 09 March 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 30 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
2.1 THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE CHARITABLE PURPOSES (THE "CHARITABLE PURPOSES") AS SUCH TERM IS DEFINED BELOW IN SUCH PROPORTIONS IN SUCH MANNER AND SUBJECT TO SUCH TERMS AND CONDITIONS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION DETERMINE. 2.2 IN THIS DEED THE EXPRESSION "CHARITABLE PURPOSES" SHALL MEAN 2.2.1 THE PROVISION OF OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF, FACILITIES FOR PHYSICAL RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE EITHER FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC OR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THOSE WHO BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES HAVE A NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES PROVIDED ALWAYS THAT SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AND IN PARTICULAR (WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING): 2.2.1.1 IN THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC OF THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PERSONS, WHO ARE PUPILS AT SCHOOLS AND UNIVERSITIES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD, (THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") BY ENSURING THAT DUE ATTENTION IS GIVEN TO THE PHYSICAL EDUCATION OF SUCH PUPILS AS WELL AS TO THE DEVELOPMENT AND OCCUPATION OF MINDS AND, WITH A VIEW TO FURTHERING THAT OBJECT, TO PROVIDE FUNDS AND TO ASSIST IN THE ORGANISATION AND PROVISION OF FACILITIES WHICH WILL ENABLE AND ENCOURAGE SUCH PUPILS TO PARTICIPATE IN PHYSICAL RECREATION AND SPORT. 2.2.1.2 THE PROMOTION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE STUDY OF AND RESEARCH INTO THE CAUSES, TREATMENT AND AVOIDANCE OF ANY INJURY, AILMENT, COMPLAINT OR DISABILITY WHICH ARISES OR MAY ARISE FROM PARTICIPATION IN OR TRAINING FOR ANY SPORT, SPORTING ACTIVITY, OR OTHER FORM OF PHYSICAL EDUCATION OR RECREATION ANYWHERE IN THE WORLD, EITHER BY DIRECT GRANT TO, OR REMUNERATION OF, INDIVIDUALS ENGAGED IN SUCH STUDY OR RESEARCH OR BY PAYMENT TO A FUND, FOUNDATION, HOSPITAL, INSTITUTION, CORPORATE BODY OR TRUST ENGAGED IN SUCH RESEARCH. 2.2.1.3 THE PROVISION OF RELIEF AND/OR TREATMENT FOR ANYONE SUFFERING FROM ANY INJURY, AILMENT, COMPLAINT OR DISABILITY BY PAYMENT TO A FUND, FOUNDATION, HOSPITAL, INSTITUTION, CORPORATE BODY OR TRUST ENGAGED IN SUCH RELIEF AND/OR TREATMENT, AND 2.3 SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES WHICH ARE EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE ACCORDING TO THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
5 St Bride Street
London
EC4A 4AS
- Phone:
- 02070781966
- Email:
- sarah.johnson@boostct.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window