THE FRIENDS OF OXFORD BOTANIC GARDEN & ARBORETUM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO SUPPORT & ASSIST THE WORK OF OXFORD BOTANIC GARDEN & HARCOURT ARBORETUM BY SEEKING FINANCIAL SUPPORT
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 29 February 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
100 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 03 November 2005: Standard registration
- THE FRIENDS OF OXFORD BOTANIC GARDEN (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF OXFORD BOTANIC GARDEN & HARCOURT ARBORETUM (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Percival Leighfield | Trustee | 27 September 2024 |
|
|||||
Dr Janita Good | Trustee | 24 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Professor John Geddes | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Marius Apetrei | Trustee | 06 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Simon John Hiscock | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 29/02/2020 | 28/02/2021 | 28/02/2022 | 28/02/2023 | 29/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £360.91k | £229.70k | £283.91k | £291.93k | £226.05k | |
|
Total expenditure | £193.95k | £119.57k | £358.82k | £137.45k | £93.75k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 29 February 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2024 | 19 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2023 | 13 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2022 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2022 | 14 July 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 28 February 2021 | 18 July 2022 | 202 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 28 February 2021 | 19 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 29 February 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 29 February 2020 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 26/08/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 22/12/2011 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 16 APR 2018 as amended on 25 Jan 2021
Charitable objects
TO SUPPORT AND ASSIST THE WORK OF THE OXFORD BOTANIC GARDEN (WHICH TERM SHALL CONNOTE THE UNIVERSITY OF OXFORD BOTANIC GARDEN, THE HARCOURT ARBORETUM AND ANY OTHER PARK OR GARDEN OWNED OR MANAGED BY THE OXFORD BOTANIC GARDEN) AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THAT PURPOSE: 3.1 TO PROMOTE THE GATHERING, EXCHANGE AND DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION CONCERNING THE OXFORD BOTANIC GARDEN; 3.2 TO SEEK FINANCIAL SUPPORT BY WAY OF SUBSCRIPTION, VOLUNTARY CONTRIBUTION, SPONSORSHIP, GRANT, ADVERTISING, LEGACIES AND SUCH OTHER MEANS AS SHALL SEEM CONDUCIVE TO THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY; 3.3 TO ORGANISE VISITS TO THE OXFORD BOTANIC GARDEN AND OTHER PARKS, GARDENS AND LANDSCAPES OF EDUCATIONAL, BOTANIC, HISTORIC OR AESTHETIC INTEREST; 3.4 TO ARRANGE AND PROVIDE FOR EXHIBITIONS, TRAINING COURSES, CLASSES AND SEMINARS; 3.5 TO PRINT, PUBLISH, SELL, SPONSOR AND DISTRIBUTE NEWSLETTERS, BOOKS, MAGAZINES AND OTHER PUBLICATIONS (INCLUDING ELECTRONIC COMMUNICATION) RELATING TO THE OXFORD BOTANIC GARDEN; 3.6 TO PROMOTE AND PUBLISH RESEARCH INTO THE HISTORY AND DEVELOPMENT OF THE OXFORD BOTANIC GARDEN.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
University of Oxford
Botanic Gardens
High Street
Oxford
OX1 4AZ
- Phone:
- 01865 610303
- Email:
- No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window