NEWCASTLE CHRISTIAN LIFE CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The advancement of the Christian faith by the pronouncement of the Gospel of Jesus Christ and preaching and teaching the word of God. This is achieved by the operation of local churches in Newcastle,Teesside and Mwanza in Tanzania.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2017
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Darlington
- Durham
- Gateshead
- Hartlepool
- Newcastle Upon Tyne City
- North Tyneside
- Northumberland
- South Tyneside
- Stockton-on-tees
- Sunderland
- Tanzania
Governance
- NCLC (Working name)
- NEWCASTLE CLC (Working name)
- Investment
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/08/2016 | 31/08/2017 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £900.84k | £568.03k | £606.57k | £708.46k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £363.42k | £518.01k | £535.40k | £771.35k | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £856.16k | £471.98k | £488.21k | £592.60k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £27.51k | £78.06k | £93.12k | £3.05k | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £17.05k | £17.82k | £24.94k | £112.21k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £122 | £166 | £296 | £599 | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £336.53k | £486.58k | £490.19k | £766.31k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | £5.03k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £22.57k | £27.53k | £44.12k | £62.82k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2017 | 11 June 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2016 | 12 October 2017 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2016 | 01 June 2017 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 20 January 2016 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | 29 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 22 January 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 19 December 2014 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
(I) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY THE PROCLAMATION AND FURTHERANCE OF THE GOSPEL OF GOD CONCERNING HIS SON JESUS CHRIST THE LORD AND PREACHING AND TEACHING OF THE WORD OF GOD BY THE COMPANY IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF FAITH OF ASSEMBLIES OF GOD AS APPROVED BY THE GENERAL COUNCIL FROM TIME TO TIME ("THE STATEMENT"); (II) SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS SHALL FURTHER THE ATTAINMENT OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS OR ANY OF THEM; (III) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE OTHER CHARITABLE WORK OF THE COMPANY CONSISTENTLY WITH THE STATEMENT; AND (IV) THE FURTHERANCE OF THE WORK OF ASSEMBLIES OF GOD AND PROMOTION OF THE SPIRITUAL TEACHING AND MAINTENANCE OF THE STATEMENT AND THE PROMOTION OF RELIGIOUS OBSERVANCES THAT MANIFEST THE STATEMENT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. NEWCASTLE, GATESHEAD, NORTH TYNESIDE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window