CHAFFORD GORGES LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aim to improve the wildlife habitats of the nature park in order to broaden the biodiversity of the site and conserve existing species. The site is used for local community events and also for education activities for all ages as it is the major open green space for a large new housing development.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £90,666 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
44 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- 31 March 2006: Standard registration
- CHAFFORD GORGES (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Richard Yates | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Dr Jeremy Dagley | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Samantha Quill | Trustee | 12 July 2022 |
|
|||||
Philip John Cunningham | Trustee | 28 April 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.29k | £140.28k | £139.71k | £130.41k | £222.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £107.58k | £95.77k | £109.45k | £119.14k | £192.76k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £1.69k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.69k | £1.70k | N/A | N/A | £90.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 06 September 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 08 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 07 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 15 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 29 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JULY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 23 MARCH 2006
Charitable objects
3A. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC TO LOOK AFTER AND FURTHER THE CONSERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND PROTECTION OF: - (I) THE AREA KNOWN AS CHAFFORD HUNDRED GORGES COMPRISING APPROXIMATELY 200 ACRES OF LAND IN THE BOROUGH OF THURROCK, ESSEX, INCLUDING WARREN GORGE, LION GORGE, GIBBS WOOD, WOULDHAM CLIFF, GRAYS GORGE, SANDMARTIN CLIFF AND ANY ADDITIONAL LAND THAT IS CONTIGUOUS WITH THIS AREA; (II) THE WILDLIFE AND HABITATS OF THIS AREA; (III) THE NATURAL BEAUTY OF THIS AREA; (IV) THE ZOOLOGICAL, BOTANICAL, HISTORICAL, BIODIVERSITY, ARCHAEOLOGICAL, SCIENTIFIC, GEOLOGICAL, AMENITY AND LANDSCAPE INTEREST OF THIS AREA, IN ANY AREA WHICH ARE CHARITABLE IN LAW. B. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN: (I) THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES ASSOCIATED WITH THE CONSERVATION, MAINTENANCE AND PROTECTION OF AREAS LIKE CHAFFORD HUNDRED GORGES; (II) THE PRINCIPLE AND PRACTICES OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT; (III) THE PRINCIPLES AND PRACTICES OF BIODIVERSITY CONSERVATION, IN ANY WAYS WHICH ARE CHARITABLE IN LAW.
Area of benefit
THE AREA KNOWN AS CHAFFORD HUNDRED GORGES COMPRISING APPROXIMATELY 200 ACRES OF LAND IN THE BOROUGH OF THURROCK, ESSEX.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Essex Wildlife Trust
Joan Elliot Visitor Centre
Abbotts Hall Farm
Maldon Road
Great Wigborough
COLCHEST
- Phone:
- 01621862960
- Email:
- admin@essexwt.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window