THE THANET YOUTH AND COMMUNITY CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Youth and community activities and public space
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
Total income includes £30,540 from 2 government contract(s) and £30,540 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Camden
Governance
- THE THANET (Working name)
- THANET BOYS CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Brown | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Carl Fox | Trustee | 19 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Paul John Stephens | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Damien Anyasi | Trustee | 12 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Tom Steele | Trustee | 21 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
DEREK ANTHONY PURCELL | Trustee | 04 September 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £138.01k | £82.34k | £106.15k | £117.02k | £137.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £124.47k | £108.61k | £87.38k | £121.60k | £125.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £30.54k | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £47.20k | £20.29k | £67.95k | £30.54k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 21 March 2025 | 234 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 21 March 2025 | 234 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 06 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 August 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 04 August 2022 | 5 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 29 April 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 10 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 30 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 28 JUL 2016 AS REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 30 AUG 2016
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE HAVERSTOCK WARD OF THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN AND ALL WARDS IMMEDIATELY NEIGHBOURING IT, WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID RESIDENTS AND LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FREE OR AFFORDABLE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECTIVE OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR RESIDENTS AND VISITORS TO THE AREA. IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE, THE DIRECTORS AND CHARITY TRUSTEES SHALL HAVE POWER TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY) A COMMUNITY CENTRE FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE CHARITY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS. (B) PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS MAY FROM TIME TO TIME BE DETERMINED.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE THE LONDON BOROUGH OF CAMDEN.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THANET YOUTH CLUB
MALDEN HALL
HERBERT STREET
LONDON
NW5 4HD
- Phone:
- 02081271313
- Email:
- info@thethanet.com
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window