FRIENDS OF ATWOOD PRIMARY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organises and runs fundraising activities and social events for the benefit of pupils of Atwood Primary Academy and their families.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charitable Activities
- Croydon
Governance
- 17 November 2005: Standard registration
- ATWOOD P A (Working name)
- ATWOOD PRIMARY SCHOOL PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- ATWOOD PARENTS ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Gareth Simkins | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|||||
Sabrina Abberley | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Kate Mackaskill | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Linda Wilson | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katie Harris | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Yasmin Fink | Trustee | 10 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Katie Kelly | Trustee | 25 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Alia | Trustee | 25 February 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kevin Rhodes | Trustee | 13 February 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £43.30k | £19.93k | £45.82k | £48.48k | £47.93k | |
|
Total expenditure | £41.90k | £17.35k | £44.64k | £36.97k | £41.17k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 27 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 24 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 09 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 06 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 24 MAY 2005 AND AMENDED 2 NOVEMBER 2010 AS AMENDED ON 27/02/2015
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS IN THE SCHOOL IN PARTICULAR BY 2.1 DEVELOPING EFFECTIVE RELATIONSHIPS BETWEEN THE STAFF PARENTS AND OTHERS ASSOCIATED WITH THE SCHOOL; 2.2 ENGAGING IN ACTIVITIES OR PROVIDING FACILITIES OR EQUIPMENT WHICH SUPPORT THE SCHOOL AND ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUPILS;
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE SANDERSTEAD,CROYDON.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Atwood Primary School
Limpsfield Road
SOUTH CROYDON
CR2 9EE
- Phone:
- 02086577374
- Email:
- CONTACTATWOODPA@GMAIL.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window