Governing document The TechSoup Trust

Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 17 OCTOBER 2005 AS AMENDED 26 JULY 2006 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL WRITTEN RESOLUTION DATED 23 MARCH 2010. NAME AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME 5 OCTOBER 2007 as amended on 14 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
(3.1) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION IN ALL ASPECTS OF CHARITIES AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS THROUGHOUT THE WORLD INCLUDING (BUT NOT LIMITED TO) THEIR ACTIVITIES, REGULATION AND SYSTEMS OF ORGANISATION; (3.2) TO PROMOTE CHARITY AND CHARITABLE ENDEAVOURS; (3.3) TO PROMOTE THE VOLUNTARY SECTOR FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC; AND (3.4) TO PROMOTE EFFICIENCY AND EFFECTIVENESS OF CHARITIES BY (AMONGST OTHER THINGS) ENCOURAGING THE ESTABLISHMENT OF INTERNATIONAL, NATIONAL, REGIONAL OR LOCAL CIVIL SOCIETY ORGANISATIONS TO DEVELOP AND MAINTAIN PUBLICLY AVAILABLE DATABASES ABOUT THE ACTIVITIES AND FINANCES OF CHARITIES ESTABLISHED IN PARTICULAR JURISDICTIONS. ('THE OBJECTS')
Area of benefit
THROUGHOUT THE WORLD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.