GURU MANEYO GRANTH GURDWARA

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objectives of the charity are to advance the Sikh religion, including by the provision of temples and to relive poverty and sickness and to advance education both generally and in the principles of the Sikh faith for the benefit of the public.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
Total income:
£1,451,000
Donations and legacies | £1.24m | |
Charitable activities | £0 | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £176.30k | |
Other | £32.24k |
Total expenditure:
£1,267,015
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £1.27m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £1.27m | |
Retained for future use | £183.99k |
People

7 Trustee(s)
300 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Slough
- Swindon
Governance
- 09 November 2005: Standard registration
- PRABH MILNAE KAA CHAAO GURDWARA (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Harbinder Singh Badwal | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Palvinder Lallh | Trustee | 11 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Surinder Hayre | Trustee | 31 December 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mandeep Kaur Dosanjh | Trustee | 31 December 2019 |
|
|
||||
Savraj Dhillon | Trustee | 03 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kulwant Sidhu | Trustee | 03 February 2014 |
|
|
||||
AJIT SINGH KHAIRA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £754.02k | £976.29k | £3.82m | £1.78m | £1.45m | |
|
Total expenditure | £796.43k | £552.80k | £930.41k | £1.12m | £1.27m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £518.57k | £772.91k | £3.58m | £1.06m | £1.24m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £232.92k | £202.87k | £236.77k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £186.25k | £0 | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £507 | £2.66k | £4.61k | £176.30k | |
|
Income - Other | £2.53k | £0 | £0 | £535.35k | £32.24k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £796.43k | £552.80k | £930.41k | £1.12m | £1.27m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £6.37k | £0 | £12.46k | £9.60k | £8.00k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £25.00k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £10.41m | £10.23m | £14.09m | £13.64m | £13.87m | |
|
Long-term investments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £800.00k | £1.21m | £420.99k | £1.26m | £982.45k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £4.10m | £3.90m | £3.82m | £3.53m | £3.31m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | 18 May 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 22 June 2024 | 22 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | 22 June 2024 | 22 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | 26 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | |||
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | |||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 02 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | 02 May 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 07/07/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 09/08/2009 AS AMENDED ON 07 JUL 2021 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07 JUL 2021 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 JUL 2021
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE COMPANY (THE "OBJECTS") ARE: (A) TO ADVANCE THE SIKH RELIGION, INCLUDING BY THE PROVISION OF TEMPLES (B) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS AND TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BOTH GENERALLY AND IN THE PRINCIPLES OF THE SIKH FAITH FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
SWINDON AND THE SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Guru Maneyo Granth Gurdwara
221 Bath Road
Slough
Berkshire
SL1 4BA
- Phone:
- 01753 573196
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window