WITHYCOMBE RALEIGH CHURCH BELL RESTORATION FUND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the learning of 12-bell ringing in Devon and to maintain the present ring of bells at Withycombe Raleigh Church in good working order
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2008
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 17 November 2005: Standard registration
- 29 November 2010: Removed (Ceased to exist)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/08/2006 | 30/09/2007 | 30/09/2008 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £47.71k | £419 | £728 | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.38k | £8.71k | £263 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2008 | 02 August 2009 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2008 | 30 November 2008 | On Time | |
Annual return | 30 September 2007 | 31 October 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2007 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2006 | 31 May 2007 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2006 | 31 May 2007 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN RELIGION BY PROVIDING FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE TO THE CHURCH OF ST JOHN THE EVANGELIST, WITHYCOMBE RALEIGH WITH EXMOUTH, IN THE DIOCESE OF EXETER IN THE COUNTY OF DEVON FOR THE PURPOSE OF MAINTAINING AND IMPROVING THE BELL INSTALLATION BY MAKING GRANTS TO IT. MAINTENANCE, IMPROVEMENT AND AUGMENTATION OF THE BELL INSTALLATION SHALL BE DEEMED TO INCLUDE TAKING OUT, OVERHAULING AND RECLAPPERING EXISTING BELLS, RECASTING OR REPLACEMENTS OF FAULTY BELLS BY ANY MEANS INCLUDING ACQUISITION OF BELLS FROM CHURCHES DECLARED REDUNDANT, OVERHAULING OR REPLACING THE EXISTING FRAME, FITTINGS AND SUPPORT STRUCTURE AND RE-ERECTION, AND THE PROVISION, INSTALLATION AND MAINTENANCE OF SOUND CONTROL, AND THE MAINTENANCE OF FIXTURES AND FITTINGS AND THE UPKEEP OF THE RINGING CHAMBER FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
WITHYCOMBE RALEIGH WITH EXMOUTH, DEVON
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window