Accounts and annual returns THERAPY SERVICES (UK)

Charity number: 1116558
Charity reporting is up to date (75 days late)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 October 2023 14 November 2024 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 October 2022 14 December 2023 105 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2022 14 December 2023 105 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2021 31 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2021 31 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2020 29 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2020 29 August 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 October 2019 02 April 2021 214 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 October 2019 02 April 2021 214 days late Download Open in new window