Financial history THERAPY SERVICES (UK)

Charity Number: 1116558
Charity reporting is up to date (75 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2019 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023
Total gross income £73.26k £70.52k £47.94k £63.95k £10.30k
Total expenditure £56.43k £35.89k £11.89k £17.53k £16.63k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A £10.00k
Income from government grants £42.18k £44.29k N/A N/A N/A