ACCESSIBLE SAILING

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity raises funds to improve facilities for disabled and disadvantaged sailors at Farmoor Reservoir. The initial project to be funded is a stable pontoon with wheelchair ramps and an electric lift so that less able sailors can get to their boats, and if necessary be hoisted into their boats. The facility for disadvantaged sailors is open to sailors over a wide area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 May 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 10 May 2006: Standard registration
- THE FARMOOR RESERVOIR PONTOON PROJECT (Working name)
- Investment
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Christopher Sidney Winston Ward | Chair | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
MURRAY JOHN BARDEN PALMER | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Gareth Malyon Lewis Griffiths | Trustee | 07 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/05/2020 | 31/05/2021 | 31/05/2022 | 31/05/2023 | 31/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28 | £1 | £0 | £3.74k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.00k | £3.05k | £0 | £3.24k | £2.57k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 May 2024 | 23 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 92 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2022 | 29 March 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 May 2020 | 14 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 4 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF SAILING OR SAILING RELATED ACTIVITIES FOR PEOPLE WITHOUT ACCESS, WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE FARMOOR, OXFORDSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
OXFORD SAILING CLUB
CUMNOR ROAD
FARMOOR
OXFORD
OX2 9NS
- Phone:
- 01865863201
- Email:
- proctor1a@aol.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window