LATITUDE CARE NETWORK LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
LCN provides Health, Social Care and Social Support, Advice, Information and Advocacy, Counselling/Psychosocial Care, International Development, Sponsor or Undertake Research, social Event and activities, umbrella body, Education, Training and Employment, Enviromnetal and Climate Change, Lobbying and Campaign and Volunteer Recruitment and Development in the London Area and Northern Ugandan Region.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
14 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Uganda
Governance
- 26 April 2006: Standard registration
- LCN (Working name)
- Care Quality Commission
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Homes England
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Grace Adok | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rev Modicum Okello | Trustee | 14 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
JANE ATUBE | Trustee | 23 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
SANTA AKULLO | Trustee | 23 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE ATIM | Trustee |
|
||||||
HARRIET JANE ABER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GRACE ADOK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £28.10k | £31.91k | £27.12k | £15.27k | £26.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £28.08k | £26.37k | £26.35k | £16.16k | £27.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 31 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 09 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 01 February 2022 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 February 2021 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 March 2021 | 30 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 6 SEPTEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 1 APRIL 2006
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS FOR WHICH THE COMPANY IS ESTABLISHED ARE PARTICULARLY BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY FOR INDIVIDUALS FROM SOCIALLY OR ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED BACKGROUND, THE ELDERLY AND PERSONS WITH DISABILITIES: 3.1 TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF VULNERABLE AND DISADVANTAGED MEMBERS OF SOCIETY WHO ARE PREDOMINATELY REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS LIVING IN THE LONDON AREA. 3.2 TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF ELDERLY AND DISABLED PEOPLE AND PEOPLE FACING DIFFICULTIES IN FAMILY RELATIONSHIPS. 3.3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION THROUGH VOCATIONALTRAINING FOR THE UNEMPLOYED OF THOSE SEEKING EMPLOYMENT INCLUDING SINGLE PARENTS, REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS. 3.4 TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND DISTRESS AMONGST THE PEOPLE IN AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR THOSE WHO ARE VICTIMS OF WAR AND NATURAL DISASTERS. 3.5 TO PROMOTE EQUALITY AND DIVERSITY IN SOCIETY BY HOLDING VARIOUS SOCIAL AND CULTURAL EVENTS OF SUFFICIENT CONTENT AND QUALITY FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
LONDON AREA AND AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
CO ORDINATOR
7B MELROSE AVENUE
LONDON
NW2 4LH
- Phone:
- 07951817866
- Email:
- info@latitudecarenetwork.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window