FRIENDS OF ST. LAURENCE'S SCALBY

Charity number: 1113260
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Beautify and assist in the maintenance of the churchyard and fabric of the Parish Church of St. Laurence, Scalby in the Diocese of York and Church Rooms

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £5,326
Total expenditure: £949

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 March 2006: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
HILARY SUSAN TRUEFITT Trustee
THE CHARITY OF CHRISTOPHER KELD
Received: On time
THE YORK DIOCESAN MINISTERS' RELIEF (2009) FUND
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIATICAL PARISH OF ST LAURENCE, SCALBY
Received: On time
MR GEOFF WINN Trustee
SCARBOROUGH FLOWER FUND HOMES
Received: On time
SARAH LOUISE McCarthy Trustee
None on record
JOHN BRIAN MITCHELL Trustee
None on record
KAETRIN NEWTON Trustee
None on record
YVETTE UNITY DRABBLE Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £4.94k £3.16k £3.22k £5.38k £5.33k
Total expenditure £734 £30.17k £213 £194 £949
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 17 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 30 November 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 18 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 13 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
5 Beech Court
North Street
Scalby
Scarborough
YO13 0RU
Phone:
01723362414
Website:

No information available