Accounts and annual returns OPENGATE A NETWORK OF COMMUNITY CHAPLAINCY

Charity number: 1113431
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2021 31 March 2022 59 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 19 January 2022 353 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2019 31 January 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2019

(These accounts
have been qualified)

31 January 2020 On Time