Trustees THE MID-DERBYSHIRE ASSOCIATION FOR MOBILE PHYSIOTHERAPY
Charity number: 1112204

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELIZABETH JANE TARLING | Chair | 14 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Lucy Merttins Walker-Okeover | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Dawn Stenhouse | Trustee | 03 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Janet Elizabeth Rose | Trustee | 20 August 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katherine Elizabeth Sinclair Nieper | Trustee | 24 November 2021 |
|
|
||||
Pat Hall | Trustee | 01 August 2014 |
|
|
||||
PAMELA MARY SUSAN CRICHTON-STUART | Trustee | 14 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
ALICE MARY LOUISE SHIELDS | Trustee | 12 February 2012 |
|
|
||||
DEBORAH JANE CHETWYND-TALBOT | Trustee | 12 February 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.