Accounts and annual returns FOUNDATION FOR ENDANGERED SPECIES

Charity number: 1114728
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 30 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2023 04 July 2024 150 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2022 31 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2021 16 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 05 April 2020 24 March 2021 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 Not Required