THE FAMILY DEVELOPMENT PROJECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The project provides support to local families through advocacy and information as well as activities that include basic education and training courses, group activities for children in different age levels, a weekly homework club (term-time only) and mid week family work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 03 July 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sheffield City
Governance
- 03 January 2006: Standard registration
- 31 March 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 31 March 2015: Funds transferred to 1151624 THE FAMILY DEVELOPMENT PROJECT
- THE ATTERCLIFFE AND DARNALL FAMILY DEVELOPMENT PROJECT (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 03/07/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £117.97k | £173.28k | £189.08k | £199.77k | £168.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £112.61k | £160.19k | £189.25k | £178.88k | £237.68k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 03 July 2013 | 31 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 03 July 2013 | 23 September 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 17 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 17 January 2013 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 19 October 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 24 October 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 4 OCTOBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY A DEED OF VARIATION DATED 6 DECEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND IF THOUGHT FIT THE CAPITAL THEREOF FOR THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSE: (A) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF YOUNG PARENTS IN SHEFFIELD AND DISTRICTS WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF DISABILITY, GENDER, HEALTH STATUS, POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINION, RACE OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION BY BRINGING TOGETHER THE CHURCHES, STATUTORY AND VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE PUBLIC EDUCATION IN PARTICULAR IN THE AREA OF CHILD DEVELOPMENT; AND (B) TO PROMOTE THE MENTAL, SPIRITUAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF SUCH PERSONS SO AS TO DEVELOP THEIR FULL CAPACITIES AS YOUNG PARENTS AND SO THAT THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE MAY BE IMPROVED.
Area of benefit
SHEFFIELD AND DISTRICTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window