LIFELINE INTERNATIONAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To relieve the poverty and hardship of teenage mothers and women in Africa and worldwide whether through deprivation of family,skills,education or otherwise,so that they may participate in a learning environment and/or life skill programme enabling them to integrate fair reproductive health services in their community(ies)and to assist them to gain employment.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Kent
- Throughout London
- Cameroon
- Chad
- Ghana
- Niger
- Nigeria
Governance
- 30 March 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRACE LABARAN | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Shamsiya Labaran | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
JOSEPH FIMUSANMI | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £200 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £1.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 12 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 15 August 2022 | 288 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 29 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 25 JULY 2005 AS AMENDED 15 MARCH 2006.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE POVERTY AND HARDSHIP OF TEENAGE MOTHERS IN NORTHERN NIGERIA WHETHER THROUGH DEPRIVATION OF FAMILY, SKILLS, EDUCATION OR OTHERWISE, SO THAT THEY MAY PARTICIPATE IN A LEARNING ENVIRONMENT AND / OR LIFE SKILLS PROGRAMME, ENABLING THEM TO INTEGRATE INTO THEIR COMMUNITIES AND TO ASSIST THEM TO GAIN EMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
25 JELLICOE ROAD
LONDON
N17 7BL
- Phone:
- 02083659815
- Website:
-
lli.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window