Financial history EXETER ROUND TABLE NUMBER 123 CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1112324
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £46.83k £6.85k £74.20k £115.94k £77.19k
Total expenditure £52.90k £7.67k £52.50k £129.70k £72.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A