FAITH&VICTORY CHURCH

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our activities are: The relief of financial hardship amongst those seeking asylum and those granted refugee status and their dependants living (temporarily) in Brent and the surrounding area: To preserve and protect the physical and mental health of those granted refugee status and their dependants: To advance the education and training of those granted refugee status and their dependant in need t
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 10 October 2023
Total income includes £21,000 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
3 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
- Brent
- Camden
- City Of London
- Ealing
- Hammersmith And Fulham
- Harrow
- Hillingdon
- Hounslow
- Congo (Democratic Republic)
Governance
- 08 March 2006: Standard registration
- FAITH & VICTORY CHURCH (Working name)
- FVC (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
KENISHA WHYTE | Trustee | 14 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
SHAKYL JOHNSON | Trustee | 03 May 2015 |
|
|
||||
RAISSA ETUTU | Trustee | 09 September 2014 |
|
|
||||
Kalala Max Nyembwe | Trustee | 18 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
REMEAL ANTONREECE JOHNSON | Trustee | 06 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 10/10/2019 | 10/10/2020 | 10/10/2021 | 10/10/2022 | 10/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £11.40k | £10.00k | £25.00k | £24.00k | £81.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £11.15k | £9.50k | £24.50k | £22.00k | £72.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £10.00k | £10.00k | £21.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 10 October 2023 | 13 September 2024 | 34 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2023 | 11 November 2024 | 93 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 10 October 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 October 2021 | 25 September 2022 | 46 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 October 2020 | 02 September 2021 | 23 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 10 October 2019 | 29 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 10 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 23 JANUARY 2006
Charitable objects
1. THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP AMONGST THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM AND THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS LIVING (TEMPORARILY) IN BRENT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE PROVISION OF AN INFORMATION AND ADVICE SERVICE; 2. TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS; 3. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEES STATUS AND THEIR DEPENDANTS IN NEED THEREOF SO AS TO ADVANCE THEM IN LIFE AND ASSIST THEM TO ADAPT WITHIN A NEW COMMUNITY. 4. THE RELIEF OF UNEMPLOYMENT OF THOSE GRANTED REFUGEE STATUS AND THOSE SEEKING ASYLUM BY THE PROVISION OF VOCATIONAL AND SKILLS TRAINING, ADVICE AND SUPPORT; AND 5. THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THOSE PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES.
Area of benefit
BRENT AND THE SURROUNDING AREA
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 LAKESIDE DRIVE
3rd FLOOR
PARK ROYAL
LONDON
NW10 7HQ
- Phone:
- 07481143488
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window