THE DEATH PENALTY PROJECT CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is a grant giver which provides funds to The Death Penalty Project Limited (DPP Ltd), enabling it to provide free legal representation to prisoners under sentence of death. The charity and DPP Ltd also conduct capacity building programmes for legal and medical professionals; and develop and commission research studies on issues surrounding the death penalty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Bangladesh
- Barbados
- Belarus
- Belize
- Dominica
- Ghana
- Grenada
- Guyana
- India
- Indonesia
- Jamaica
- Japan
- Kenya
- Malawi
- Malaysia
- Nigeria
- Saint Vincent
- Sierra Leone
- Singapore
- St Kitts And Nevis
- St Lucia
- Taiwan
- Tanzania
- The Bahamas
- Trinidad And Tobago
- Uganda
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 03 July 2006: Standard registration
- THE DEATH PENALTY PROJECT CHARITABLE TRUST (Working name)
- THE DEATH PENALTY PROJECT (CT) (Previous name)
- THE DEATH PENALTY PROJECT LIMITED (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ANTHONY CHARLES BURTON CBE | Chair |
|
||||||
SIMON GOLDBERG | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
EDWARD FITZGERALD QC | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £211.48k | £146.67k | £209.27k | £172.50k | £92.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £214.02k | £144.60k | £182.25k | £204.62k | £103.02k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 18 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 31 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 22 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 25/08/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 03/04/2006
Charitable objects
1 TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT HUMAN RIGHTS IN THE CARIBBEAN, ANGLOPHONE AFRICAN COUNTRIES AND ELSEWHERE AND PARTICULARLY THE RIGHTS OF INDIVIDUALS ACCUSED OF CRIMES THAT ARE PUNISHABLE BY DEATH AND OF THOSE WHO HAVE BEEN SENTENCED TO DEATH; 2 TO PROMOTE THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF THE LAW; 3 TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, RESEARCH AND TRAINING IN DOMESTIC AND INTERNATIONAL LAW (INCLUDING INTERNATIONAL HUMAN RIGHTS LAW), AND IN PARTICULAR CONCERNING THE OPERATION OF THE DEATH PENALTY; AND IN CLAUSE 1 'TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT HUMAN RIGHTS' MEANS TO PROMOTE AND PROTECT THE RIGHTS ENSHRINED IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS 1948, THE AMERICAN DECLARATION ON THE RIGHTS AND DUTIES OF MAN 1948, THE INTERNATIONAL COVENANT ON CIVIL AND POLITICAL RIGHTS 1966, THE AMERICAN CONVENTION ON HUMAN RIGHTS 1978 AND THE AFRICAN CHARTER ON HUMAN AND PEOPLES' RIGHTS 1981.
Area of benefit
CARIBBEAN, ANGLOPHONE AFRICAN COUNTRIES AND ELSEWHERE
Contact information
- Address:
-
87-91 NEWMAN STREET
LONDON
W1T 3EY
- Phone:
- 02032062748
- Email:
- info@deathpenaltyproject.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window