DOWNLAND VOLUNTEER GROUP

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We provide transport for persons in the Downland areas of West Berkshire who are elderly, sick or disabled or who are otherwise in need. We take people to Hospitals, Doctors' Surgeries, Dentists, Opticians, to social meetings and to anywhere else that may be appropriate.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £4,880 from 1 government grant(s)
People

3 Trustee(s)
55 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Disability
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- West Berkshire
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 21 November 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
William Gareth Beard | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Joe Clerkin | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
|
||||
JEAN POCOCK | Trustee | 07 October 2015 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £14.01k | £4.05k | £3.54k | £179.28k | £38.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.97k | £3.25k | £3.70k | £13.14k | £102.36k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.01k | N/A | N/A | £54.08k | £4.88k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 26 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 06 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 16 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 23 SEPTEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN THE DOWNLAND AREAS WHO ARE ELDERLY, SICK OR DISABLED OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE IN NEED BY THE PROVISION OF VOLUNTEERS TO ASSIST SUCH PERSONS IN ANY WAY THAT MAY BE REQUIRED
Area of benefit
DOWNLAND AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Surgery
High Street
Compton
NEWBURY
RG20 6NJ
- Phone:
- 01635578394
- Email:
- dvg_office@btinternet.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window