MARIAN MISSION FOR THE POOR

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Lit and Numeracy support for SEN pupils Breakfast and After school club, Positive behaviour Mgt. progs, Positive Holiday Projects, Nursery & Pre-School for 0-5yr olds Supervised Child Contact Services, Short Break Services for disabled children, Pastoral Care, Catechesis, Catholic Parish Pastoral work, Bible studies, Liturgy, Music and Retreat services, Disabled Adult Home care services etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £75,445 from 2 government contract(s) and £4,635 from 2 government grant(s)
People

5 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Accommodation/housing
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Nigeria
Governance
- 05 December 2005: Standard registration
- Marian Mission Care Services (Working name)
- Marian Mission Educational and Family Support Centre (Working name)
- Marian Missionary Sisters of the Poor (Working name)
- Marian Retreat Centre (Working name)
- MARIAN MISSION EDUCATIONAL & FAMILY SUPPORT CENTRE (Previous name)
- MARIAN MISSIONARY SISTERS OF THE POOR (Previous name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MOTHER MARIA CHIOMA EMEAGI | Chair | 29 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
Sister Blessing Ogechi Onuoha | Trustee | 29 April 2017 |
|
|||||||
Joseph Duke | Trustee | 10 April 2013 |
|
|||||||
SISTER STELLA ENEIBI DAVIES | Trustee | 28 March 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Rev AUGUSTINE UZOMA IHEDINMA | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £170.50k | £140.84k | £199.54k | £187.04k | £192.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.26k | £169.79k | £227.70k | £179.20k | £185.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £31.68k | £24.89k | £38.70k | £51.87k | £75.44k | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.35k | £7.07k | £34.69k | £9.51k | £4.64k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 05 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 26 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 09 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 03 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 OCTOBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 NOVEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
- THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, PROTECTION AND CARE OF ABUSED, SOCIALLY EXCLUDED/POOR/UNDERPRIVILEGED CHILDREN - THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGION AND THE FINANCIAL SUPPORT OF CATHOLIC CHURCHES IN POOR RURAL COMMUNITIES - THE PROVISION OF PRIMARY HEALTH CARE FOR THE POOR.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NATIONALLY AND OVERSEAS`
Contact information
- Address:
-
MARIAN MISSION FOR THE POOR
1 Colchester Road
Leyton
LONDON
E10 6HA
- Phone:
- 02085187499
- Email:
- marianmission@aol.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window