CENTURION SHOW BAND
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
YOUTH MUSIC MARCHING BAND
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- City Of York
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 21 November 2005: Standard registration
- 24 July 2012: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- CENTURION SHOWBAND (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2007 | 31/10/2008 | 31/10/2009 | 31/10/2010 | 31/10/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.95k | £13.23k | £8.41k | £3.45k | £842 | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.91k | £13.41k | £4.72k | £4.91k | £7.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2011 | 12 July 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2010 | 17 May 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2009 | 15 June 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2009 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2008 | 18 July 2009 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2008 | 21 July 2009 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 19 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION OF MEMBERS AND LEADERS OF THE CENTURION SHOW BAND YOUTH MARCHING BAND AND THE PROMOTION OF MENTAL, MORAL AND PHYSICAL DEVELOPMENT OF YOUNG PEOPLE UP TO 25 YEARS OF AGE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF EXHIBITIONS, COMPETITIONS, CONCERTS OF MUSIC AND DANCE AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE NORTH YORKSHIRE.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window