MANCHESTER CITY CHAPEL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
i. To advance the Gospel of Jesus Christ for the benefit of the public in accordance with the statements of belief appearing in the governing document ii. To advance the Christian faith in the United Kingdom and othe nations
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 05 June 2006: Standard registration
- Authentic City Church Life Changers (Working name)
- GRACE CITY CHURCH ASSEMBLIES OFGOD (Working name)
- LIVING WATERS MANCHESTER CITY CHAPEL (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dereck Chunda | Chair |
|
||||||
Rev Phillip Banda | Trustee | 20 December 2020 |
|
|||||
Jeanette Brown | Trustee | 18 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
LANGA LIONEL NDOVIE | Trustee | 16 June 2013 |
|
|
||||
GRACE MWANZA | Trustee | 22 December 2011 |
|
|
||||
FRANK Foster VALANTINI | Trustee | 18 October 2011 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £93.17k | £112.24k | £150.32k | £198.25k | £171.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £87.11k | £104.62k | £152.94k | £157.36k | £185.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 25 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 08 May 2023 | 97 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 08 May 2023 | 97 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 22 March 2022 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 April 2021 | 65 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 11 FEBRUARY 2006
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENTS OF BELIEF APPEARING IN SCHEDULE 1 AND OUR STATEMENT OF FAITH IN ARTICLE 3 THEREIN. (II) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE HOLDING OF PRAYER MEETINGS, LECTURES, BROADCASTING, PUBLIC CELEBRATION OF RELIGIOUS FESTIVALS, PRODUCING AND/OR DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE AND ANY OTHER ACTIVITY ON CHRISTIAN FAITH TO ENLIGHTEN OTHERS ABOUT THE GRACE OF GOD IN JESUS CHRIST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
Authentic City Church
Crowcroft Road
Longsight
Manchester
M12 4QD
- Phone:
- 01612244437
- Email:
- info@authenticcitychurch.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window