HOLLYBUSH RESIDENTS ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hollybush Residents Association provides: *A forum for the local inhabitants to meet frequently and discuss items for the good and benefit of the community *Management of the Hollybush Community Centre *Facilitate courses, morning and evening classes e.g. Digital Photography, line dancing, Basic Computer Literacy, Taekwando etc.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Caerphilly
Governance
- 21 November 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Creighton LEWIS | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Peter O'Connell | Trustee | 26 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ronald Lewis | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.43k | £466 | £5.39k | £1.13k | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.54k | £0 | £1.13k | £645 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 03 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 23 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 14 DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
(1) TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE HOLLYBUSH AREA AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, OF POLITICAL, OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS AND INHABITANTS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME, OCCUPATION, WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS/QUALITY OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. (2) TO ESTABLISH OR TO SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE SUCH A CENTRE AND FOR ACTIVITIES PROMOTED BY THE ASSOCIATION IN FURTHERANCE OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS.
Area of benefit
HOLLYBUSH, CAERPHILLY
Contact information
- Address:
-
16 BANALOG TERRACE
HOLLYBUSH
BLACKWOOD
NP12 0SF
- Phone:
- 01495227464
- Email:
- gaybineham@googlemail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window