Accounts and annual returns SKILTS SCHOOL FUND

Charity Number: 1112214
Charity reporting is overdue by 1052 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 321 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 321 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 687 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 687 days
Annual return 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1052 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1052 days
Annual return 31 August 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 26 April 2021 300 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required