OXFORD DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Work with Deaf and Hard of Hearing people within the area by providing a centre, services and other support areas
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
- Oxfordshire
- Reading
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 24 November 2005: Standard registration
- 30 September 2019: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 30 September 2019: Funds transferred to 1105044 DEAF DIRECT
- THE DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING CENTRE OXFORD (Previous name)
- THE OXFORD CENTRE FOR THE DEAF AND HARD OF HEARING (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | 31/03/2016 | 31/03/2017 | 31/03/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £68.51k | £59.96k | £60.08k | £67.36k | £99.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £96.48k | £72.22k | £75.33k | £67.60k | £83.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2019 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2018 | 05 February 2019 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2018 | 05 February 2019 | 5 days late | |
Annual return | 31 March 2017 | 30 January 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2017
(These accounts |
30 January 2018 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2016 | 27 January 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2016 | 27 January 2017 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/04/2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 17/10/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 08/07/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26 MAY 2016
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE DEAF PEOPLE IN THE DIOCESE OF OXFORD BY PROVIDING FACILITIES FOR WELFARE AND TRAINING DESIGNED TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF SUCH PERSONS INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR (BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY):- - THE PROVISION OF A BUILDING AND ASSOCIATED FACILITIES FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF ALL DEAF PEOPLE IRRESPECTIVE OF DEGREE OF HEARING LOSS RESIDENT IN THE DIOCESE OF OXFORD. - THE AVAILABILITY OF THAT BUILDING FOR THE RECREATIONAL, CULTURAL, SPIRITUAL, EDUCATIONAL AND PROFESSIONAL USE OR BENEFIT OF ALL PEOPLE WITH A HEARING LOSS RESIDENT IN THE DIOCESE OF OXFORD WITHOUT REGARD TO GENDER, AGE, RACE, RELIGIOUS BELIEFS, COMMUNICATION MODE, DISABILITIES OR FAMILY CIRCUMSTANCES. - THE PROVISION OF TRAINING AND SUPPORT AND (SUBJECT TO THE AVAILABILITY OF FUNDING) THE MAKING OF GRANTS OR DONATIONS TO SUPPORT THE NEEDS OF DEAF PEOPLE AND THEIR FAMILIES IN THE DIOCESE OF OXFORD. - TO PURCHASE AND PROVIDE RESOURCES BENEFICIAL TO DEAF PEOPLE. "DEAF" SIGNIFIES ALL TYPES OF HEARING LOSS AND INCLUDES HARD OF HEARING.
Area of benefit
THE DIOCESE OF OXFORD
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window