Trustees SOUTH WILTS MENCAP

Charity Number: 1112202
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Andrew Williams Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Charlotte Feest Trustee 04 May 2022
None on record
Judith Ann Beddow Trustee 09 October 2018
None on record
PIPPA HEIDI TABITHA REIS Trustee 10 April 2018
None on record
LINDA FLORENCE LANE Trustee 10 April 2018
None on record
Nigel Athelstan Afford Trustee 11 November 2014
PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST.LAWRENCE, STRATFORD-SUB-CASTLE, WILTS
Received: On time
Robin Charles Lucas Clifford Trustee 26 November 2013
None on record
KATHERINE SEVASTIE GALLAGHER Trustee
None on record