THE AFRICAN CHILD CHARITY ORGANISATION
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TACCO's main focus is on childcare provision for children aged 18 months to 4 years old and literacy support for children up to secondary school in two rural centres in Jachie, Ashanti region and Langbinsi, in northern Region . The charity also runs a popular local IT centre and a HIV/Awareness programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2021
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Ghana
Governance
- 11 July 2006: Standard registration
- 25 March 2022: Removed (Does not operate)
- TACCO (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2017 | 30/04/2018 | 30/04/2019 | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £253 | £78 | £154 | £76 | £282 | |
|
Total expenditure | £175 | £26 | £0 | £0 | £249 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 March 2022 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 17 December 2021 | 292 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2019 | 17 December 2021 | 657 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2019 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | 17 December 2021 | 1023 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 28/09/05
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SICKNESS, THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION IN JACHIE AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES, NEAR LAKE BOSOMTWI IN GHANA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY THROUGH PROJECTS LIKE CRECHE AND A PRE-SCHOOL CENTRE, A CHILDREN'S LIBRARY, COMPUTER LEARNING CENTRE AND A HIV/AIDS AWARENESS PROGRAM.
Area of benefit
IN JACHIE AND THE SURROUNDING VILLAGES, NEAR LAKE BOSOMTWI IN GHANA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window