GHANA EDUCATION LINK
Charity number: 1114328
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- Education/training
Who the charity helps:
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
- Ghana
Governance
Registration history:
- 22 May 2006: Standard registration
- 20 March 2019: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
- GEL (Working name)
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2018 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2017 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2016 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 30 August 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2015 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED AND AMENDED 21 MARCH 2006.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE GROUP IS TO SUPPORT EDUCATION IN RURAL GHANA IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY THE BUILDING, REFURBISHING AND EQUIPPING OF SCHOOLS AND A LIBRARY.
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
IN RURAL GHANA.
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window