FRIENDS OF ST. MARYS CHURCH, SAWSTON

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We raise funds to enable us to make grants to St Mary's Church Sawston, to help maintain the fabric of the Church.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 12 January 2006: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rev Kathryn Joy Waite | Trustee | 01 April 2025 |
|
|||||||
Beck Laxton | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
|||||||
Kieran John Lawson Cooper | Trustee | 01 January 2018 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £109 | £0 | £1 | £240 | £42 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 29 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 22 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 20 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION DATED 19 APRIL 2005
Charitable objects
TO ASSIST IN THE MAINTENANCE, REPAIR, RESTORATION, PRESERVATION, IMPROVEMENT AND RECONSTRUCTION OF THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ST MARY, SAWSTON, ITS FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC
Area of benefit
THE CHURCH OF ST MARY, SAWSTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE NEW VICARAGE
CHURCH LANE
SAWSTON
CAMBRIDGE
CB22 3JR
- Phone:
- 01223832248
- Email:
- kieran@kierancooper.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window