WEST WARWICKSHIRE SPORTS COMPLEX LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To provide in the interests of social welfare and with the object of improving the conditions of life for members of the community generally a recreation ground, playing field and other sporting facilities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Solihull
Governance
- 06 December 2005: Standard registration
- 06 April 2020: Funds received from 1112428 WEST WARWICKSHIRE DEVELOPMENT TRUST
- WWSL (Working name)
- WEST WARWICKSHIRE SPORTS CLUB (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Scott Key | Trustee | 21 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Terence Andrew Dight | Trustee | 23 June 2021 |
|
|
||||
Andy Stevenson | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
ANDY O'BRIEN | Trustee | 14 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Rigg | Trustee | 22 September 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £267.02k | £1.68m | £204.30k | £333.93k | £351.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £361.92k | £1.30m | £343.48k | £495.43k | £422.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £32.40k | £29.90k | £7.75k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £32.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £236.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £187 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £1.41m | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £376.42k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £7.87k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £928.04k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 23 August 2024 | 24 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | 22 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | 29 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | 24 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | 21 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | 13 July 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10TH NOVEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION 4TH DECEMBER 2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 05 JAN 2018 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 10 SEP 2017
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE CHARITY ARE TO PROVIDE IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR MEMBERS OF MEMBERS OF THE COMMUNITY GENERALLY A RECREATION GROUND , PLAYING FIELD AND SPORTS FACILITIES
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
West Warwickshire Club Ltd
Grange Road
SOLIHULL
West Midlands
B91 1DA
- Phone:
- 07825777934
- Email:
- admin@westwarwicks.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window