THE TOPAZ TRUST LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of facilities for persons with learning and physical difficulties within the Clacton on Sea, Frinton on Sea, Walton on the Naze and surrounding area. A social club is operated for people with learning difficulties on a weekly basis and other specialist events are provided on a regular basis. Special parties and trips are also arranged as and when required.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Essex
- Suffolk
Governance
- 30 November 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Michelle Reeve | Trustee | 15 August 2023 |
|
|
||||
Brian Telford | Trustee | 17 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Joan Goodchild | Trustee | 24 February 2020 |
|
|
||||
DEONE BALDWIN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BERYL PENELOPE MEAD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MAUD SCASE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ADELE DUNN | Trustee |
|
||||||
PATRICIA BRAGG | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.05k | £0 | £5.56k | £7.91k | £9.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £7.53k | £2.47k | £13.23k | £16.95k | £17.24k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 15 March 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 15 March 2024 | 259 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 15 March 2024 | 624 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 March 2024 | 989 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 AUGUST 2005
Charitable objects
3.1 AN ORGANISATION TO PROVIDE FOR THE NEEDS OF DISADVANTAGED PERSONS INCLUDING THOSE WITH LEARNING AND PHYSICAL DISABILITIES. 3.2 TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR LEISURE ACTIVITIES FOR PERSONS WITH LEARNING AND PHYSICAL DISABILITIES BOTH AS A CLUB AND OTHER FORMS OF ACTIVITY. 3.3 TO ARRANGE AND OPERATE FUND RAISING OPPORTUNITIES TO PROMOTE THE AIMS OF THE COMPANY. 3.4 TO PROMOTE THE INTERESTS OF DISADVANTAGED PEOPLE BOTH WITHIN THE LOCAL COMMUNITY AND THE WIDER POPULATION. 3.5 TO UTILISE ANY OTHER MEANS OF PROVISION AND ASSISTANCE AS WILL, FROM TIME TO TIME, BE CONSIDERED APPROPRIATE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE. ESSEX
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST. ANDREWS HALL
ST. ANDREWS ROAD
CLACTON-ON-SEA
CO15 3AP
- Phone:
- 01255434311
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window