THE SOURCE YOUNG PEOPLE'S CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Source Young People's Charity is an inclusive local Christian Charity. We support and empower Young People aged 14-25 years living in Aldershot and the surrounding areas through bespoke 1 - 1 programmes and group work.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,750 from 1 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Provides Services
- Hampshire
- Surrey
Governance
- 11 January 2006: Standard registration
- 16 August 2021: Funds received from 1165595 THE EMMA CAMPBELL TRUST
- THE SOURCE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr Jocelyn Johnston | Chair | 01 September 2013 |
|
|
||||
STEPHEN DELVES | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|||||
Eleanor Joy North | Trustee | 23 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Roger Keith Holder | Trustee | 07 April 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Barry Douglas Bird | Trustee | 13 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Tim Heys | Trustee | 01 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £168.90k | £168.25k | £128.84k | £120.23k | £158.14k | |
|
Total expenditure | £174.43k | £153.13k | £123.71k | £128.23k | £150.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £17.00k | £36.45k | £6.53k | £1.25k | £6.75k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 28 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 19 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 24 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 27 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 29 NOVEMBER 2005 NOW ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION ADOPTED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 26 JANUARY 2011
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATIONAL AND OTHER LEISURE-TIME OCCUPATION INCLUDING BUT NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION THE PROVISION OF EDUCATION AND TRAINING IN LIFE SKILLS IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES AND WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THEIR CONDITIONS OF LIFE IN ALDERSHOT, HAMPSHIRE AND IN SUCH OTHER PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
ALDERSHOT, HAMPSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
2nd Floor
Imperial House
2 Grosvenor Road
(Entrance on Barrack Road)
Aldershot
Hampshir
- Phone:
- 01252333330
- Email:
- info@thesourceforyou.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window