FRIENDS OF OUR LADY OF LOURDES RC PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1112242
Charity reporting is up to date (238 days late)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To encourage the link between School and Church Community. To raise funds for the benefit of the children, providing additional materials essential for educational and social benefit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Total income: £13,914
Total expenditure: £17,171

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Amateur Sport
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Other Finance
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • East Sussex

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 November 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Hannah Dora Rewcastle Trustee 25 January 2024
None on record
JOANNE DAWN LOMAX SICE Trustee 20 October 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £7.80k £5.84k £6.10k £14.07k £13.91k
Total expenditure £14.30k £956 £6.85k £4.21k £17.17k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 23 February 2025 238 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 09 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 06 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 13 June 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 19 December 2019 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Our Lady of Lourdes School
The Green
Rottingdean
BRIGHTON
BN2 7HA
Phone:
01273 306980
Email:
No information available