THE BIANCA JAGGER HUMAN RIGHTS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1) Researching & raising awareness on issues of human rights & civil liberties,social & economic justice,climate change,indigenous peoples rights & environmental protection. Calling for worldwide abolition of the death penalty. 3) Developing legal definition & framework of Crimes Against Present & Future Generations. 4) Raising awarness on violence against women and girls
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout London
- Austria
- Belgium
- Brazil
- Colombia
- Costa Rica
- Ecuador
- El Salvador
- France
- Germany
- Guatemala
- Honduras
- India
- Mexico
- Nicaragua
- Peru
- Scotland
- Spain
- Sweden
- United States
- Venezuela
Governance
- 05 December 2006: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MARK HOWARD STEPHENS CBE | Chair |
|
||||||||
PETER JOHN BENNETT | Trustee | 21 January 2016 |
|
|
||||||
William Schabas | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||||
THADDAEUS ROPAC | Trustee | 05 February 2013 |
|
|
||||||
ERIK BERGLOF | Trustee | 22 January 2013 |
|
|
||||||
Bianca Jagger | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||
MARITTA KOCH-WESER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2018 | 05/04/2019 | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £65.91k | £35.75k | £58.70k | £2.89k | £95.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £217.59k | £204.49k | £165.49k | £135.46k | £78.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 90 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 456 days | |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 15 October 2024 | 618 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 15 October 2024 | 618 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 05 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 12 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
2.2.1) TO PROMOTE HUMAN RIGHTS (AS SET OUT IN THE UNIVERSAL DECLARATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS AND SUBSEQUENT UNITED NATIONS CONVENTIONS AND DECLARATIONS) THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ALL OR ANY OF THE FOLLOWING MEANS: 2.2.1.1) MONITORING ABUSES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; 2.2.1.2) OBTAINING JUSTICE FOR THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; 2.2.1.3) RELIEVING NEED AMONG THE VICTIMS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ABUSE; 2.2.1.4) RESEARCH INTO HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; 2.2.1.5) EDUCATING THE PUBLIC ABOUT HUMAN RIGHTS; 2.2.1.6) PROVIDING TECHNICAL ADVICE TO GOVERNMENT AND OTHERS ON HUMAN RIGHTS MATTERS; 2.2.1.7) CONTRIBUTING TO THE SOUND ADMINISTRATION OF HUMAN RIGHTS LAW; 2.2.1.8) COMMENTING ON PROPOSED HUMAN RIGHTS LEGISLATION; 2.2.1.9) RAISING AWARENESS OF HUMAN RIGHTS ISSUES; 2.2.1.10) PROMOTING PUBLIC SUPPORT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS; 2.2.1.11) PROMOTING RESPECT FOR HUMAN RIGHTS BY INDIVIDUALS AND CORPORATIONS; 2.2.1.12) INTERNATIONAL ADVOCACY OF HUMAN RIGHTS; 2.2.1.13) ELIMINATING INFRINGEMENTS OF THE PROHIBITIONS ON TORTURE SLAVERY EXTRA-JUDICIAL KILLING ARBITRARY DETENTION AND DISAPPEARANCE; 2.2.1.14) RAISING AWARENESS OF THE TRAFFICKING OF HUMANS IN PARTICULAR THE TRAFFICKING OF WOMEN AND CHILDREN FOR SEXUAL EXPLOITATION AND THEIR EXPOSURE TO HIV/AIDS; 2.2.1.15) CARRYING OUT OR PROMOTING RESEARCH INTO THE MAINTENANCE AND OBSERVANCE OF HUMAN RIGHTS IN PLACES OR AREAS WHERE THERE MAY HAVE BEEN AN IMPACT ON THE HUMAN RIGHTS OF THE INHABITANTS OF SUCH PLACES AND AREAS AS A CONSEQUENCE OF ENVIRONMENTAL DAMAGE OR CHANGE AND PUBLISH OR OTHERWISE DISSEMINATE THE USEFUL RESULTS OF SUCH RESEARCH 2.2.2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY DISTRESS OR SUFFERING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD BY APPROPRIATE CHARITABLE ASSISTANCE (WHETHER MEDICAL REHABILITATIVE FINANCIAL OR OTHER ASSISTANCE) TO VICTIMS OF: 2.2.2.1) BREACHES OF HUMAN RIGHTS; 2.2.2.2) ANY PUBLIC CALAMITY (INCLUDING FAMINE EARTHQUAKE OR PESTILENCE; 2.2.2.3) WAR OR CIVIL DISTURBANCE; 2.2.2.4) THE IMMEDIATE OR CONTINUING EFFECTS OF LACK OF NATURAL OR OTHER RESOURCES OR; 2.2.2.5) ANY OTHER CAUSE OF POVERTY DISTRESS OR SUFFERING. 2.2.3) SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE OBJECTS AND PURPOSES IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR DISCRETION THINK FIT..
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED IN PRACTICE NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
BJHRF PO BOX
UNIT 246 272 KENSINGTON HIGH STREET
LONDON
W8 6ND
- Phone:
- 02073610066
- Email:
- Biancajagger1@gmail.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window