Financial history AGUDA NORTH WEST

Charity number: 1112554
Charity reporting is up to date (62 days late)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £325.99k £374.81k £291.79k £321.97k £277.38k
Total expenditure £289.70k £336.96k £277.67k £332.19k £256.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £140.17k £129.76k £229.48k £248.58k £82.17k